King v. CVS Caremark Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James R King
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation and Cody Berguson
Case Number: 1:2012cv01715
Filed: April 27, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2017 296 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/12/2017. (JLC)
October 28, 2016 285 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons noted within, the court DENIES CVS's motion to alter or amend the judgment (doc. 273). Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/28/16. (SAC )
February 23, 2016 211 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 197 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, CVS's 198 New Trial Motion and 199 Remittitur Motion are GRANTED IN PART and otherwise DENIED. CVS's separate request for oral argument (Doc. 200), filed on July 1, 2015, is DENIED. Finally, the deadline for Mr. King to indicate whether he consents to the Court's remittitur of compensatory damages by $450,000, and, therefore, the final judgment by $900,000, is due no later than 30 days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/23/2016. (JLC, )
March 5, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; For the reasons explained herein, CVS's Rule 56 Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, Mr. Berguson's Rule 56 Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, the Hardage Strike Motion is TERMED as MOOT, a nd the King Strike Motion and the Non-Party Strike Motion are DENIED IN PART and TERMED as MOOT IN PART. Finally, by separate Order the Court will set this case for a Final Pretrial Conference on those claims that remain in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/5/2014. (JLC)
July 20, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, to Transfer Venue. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to place Mr. King's unredacted charge (Doc. 8-2) under seal. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/20/2012. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. CVS Caremark Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R King
Represented By: Alicia K Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Caremark Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Berguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?