Barnett v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association

Plaintiff: April K. Barnett
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2012cv01745
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Eastern Office
County: Talladega
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 93 MOTION in Limine. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART and is otherwise DENIED. Any proposed limiting instructions by Chase as identified herein are due to Ms. Barnett no later than 5:00 p.m. on January 23, 2014, a nd to the Court via chambers email no later than 8:30 a.m. on January 27, 2014. The unresolved objections are SUSTAINED IN PART, OVERRULED IN PART, TERMED as MOOT IN PART, and RESERVED IN PART. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/22/2014. (JLC)
January 16, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 82 MOTION in Limine Under Daubert to Exclude Certain Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Evan D. Hendricks as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/16/2014. (JLC)
June 26, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, FINDING AS MOOT 59 MOTION to Strike. More specifically, the following counts and claims that are set out herein are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/26/2013. (JLC)
November 7, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 18 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for Sanctions as set out herein. GRANTING 31 MOTION for Court To Accept Late Filing. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 11/7/2012. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Jason W Bobo
Represented By: Sandy G Robinson
Represented By: Michael E Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April K. Barnett
Represented By: David A McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?