Powers et al v. Chadwell Homes of Alabama LLC
Appellee: Chadwell Homes of Alabama LLC
Appellant: Gweneth Douglass Powers and Anthony D Powers
Case Number: 1:2018cv01452
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 Request by pro-se party for electronic notification by Gweneth Douglass Powers. (KEK)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Anthony D Powers, Gweneth Douglass Powers. (KEK)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by Anthony D Powers, Gweneth Douglass Powers. (KEK)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing: letter and BK documents by Anthony D Powers, Gweneth Douglass Powers. (KEK)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of filing: Opinion and Order issued by Bankruptcy Judge, James J. Robinson on 10/15/2018. (KEK)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-03267-JJR13. File received, filed by Gweneth Douglass Powers, Anthony D Powers. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet, #2 Notice of appeal, #3 Opinion & Order)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers et al v. Chadwell Homes of Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chadwell Homes of Alabama LLC
Represented By: Joshua Chad Snable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gweneth Douglass Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anthony D Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?