First American Title Insurance Company v. Winfrey et al

Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Eva Winfrey and Charles Winfrey
Case Number: 1:2018cv01556
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Charles Winfrey and Eva Winfrey. (JLC)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default against Eva Winfrey by First American Title Insurance Company. (Odom, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against Charles Winfrey by First American Title Insurance Company. (Odom, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First American Title Insurance Company. Eva Winfrey served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Odom, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First American Title Insurance Company. Charles Winfrey served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Odom, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First American Title Insurance Company. filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Odom, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles Winfrey and Eva Winfrey, returned to Plaintiffs' attorney for service on this the 24th day of September, 2018. (JLC)
September 24, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3179517, NDAL receipt #B4601092207.(Odom, Michael) Modified on 9/24/2018 (JLC).
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles Winfrey, Eva Winfrey, filed by First American Title Insurance Company.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First American Title Insurance Company v. Winfrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael B Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?