Sisk v. Toyota Motor North America Inc

Plaintiff: Patty Lynn Sisk
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc and Glenn Smith Automotive LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01583
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay litigation 120 days. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/29/2018. (TLM, )
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Remand . Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/29/2018. (TLM, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw #4 MOTION to Remand by Patty Lynn Sisk. (Crow, Christina)
October 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/24/2018. (SAC )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The court sets a telephone STATUS CONFERENCE for Wednesday, October 24, 2018, 4:45 PM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Parties are instructed to use the following numbers to attend: phone number 877-336-1829/access code 9230658. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/22/18. (SAC )
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay by Toyota Motor North America Inc. (Brown, David)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 *****WITHDRAWN PURSUANT DOC 7*** MOTION to Remand by Patty Lynn Sisk. (Crow, Christina) Modified on 10/29/2018 (TLM, ). Modified on 10/29/2018 (TLM, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601092437. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor North America Inc from Circuit Court of Talladega, case number 61-cv-2018-900356.00. (), filed by Toyota Motor North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(TLM, ). (Brown, David) Modified on 10/3/2018 (TLM, ).
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor North America Inc.(Brown, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Toyota Motor North America Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - Corrected)(Brown, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor North America Inc from Circuit Court of Talladega, case number 61-cv-2018-900356.00. (), filed by Toyota Motor North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisk v. Toyota Motor North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America Inc
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Represented By: Emily Hill Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Smith Automotive LLC
Represented By: David L Brown, Jr
Represented By: Emily Hill Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Lynn Sisk
Represented By: Christina D Crow
Represented By: Valerie D Rucker-Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?