Garrett v. Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC

Plaintiff: Curtis Garrett
Defendant: Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00078
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/21/2019. (BST, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Curtis Garrett, Heritage Freight Warehousing & Logistics LLC. (BST, )
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 3/28/2019 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 3/13/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott Parties are to call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 3/13/2019, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/19/2019. (KAM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/19/2019. (BST, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC. filed by Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC (Hamilton, Charles)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC.(Hamilton, Charles)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Curtis Garrett. Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (KAM)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Heritage Freight Warehousing & Logistics LLC via certified U.S. Mail on this the 18th day of January, 2019. (JLC)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Curtis Garrett. (Leonard, Heather)
January 15, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3256872. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Heritage Freight Warehousing & Logistics LLC, filed by Curtis Garrett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM, ). (Leonard, Heather)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heritage Freight Warehousing & Logistics LLC, filed by Curtis Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Garrett
Represented By: Heather N Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Freight warehousing & Logistics LLC
Represented By: Charles K Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?