Gamble v. Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Gamble
Defendant: Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00143
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted (certified mail) as to Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC; RETURN TO SENDER; ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD. (KWC)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Gamble. Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Long, Felicia)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC, mailed by certified mail #9414 7118 9956 0082 8342 43. (KWC) Modified on 2/1/2019 (KWC)
January 31, 2019 Filing fee received from Kira Y Fonteneau in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3267077; USDC receipt number B4601095054; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC, filed by Anthony Gamble. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 1/31/2019 (KWC)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/30/2019. (KWC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Anthony Gamble. (KWC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Anthony Gamble. (KWC)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC, filed by Anthony Gamble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fleetwood Metal Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gamble
Represented By: Kira Y Fonteneau
Represented By: Felicia Teanna Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?