Warwick v. Carroll et al

Plaintiff: Demetro Warwick
Defendant: Jeffery Allen Carroll and Duvall Chemicals, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00545
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT - Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze. Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins no longer assigned to the case. (KWC)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: see all instructions and deadlines as set out. Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/14/2019. (KWC)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, Sara)
May 21, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetro Warwick, see doc #8 . Jeffery Allen Carroll served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (KWC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeffery Allen Carroll, filed by Demetro Warwick. (Williams, Sara)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jeffery Allen Carroll, Duvall Chemicals, LLC.(Darneille, Jason)
May 1, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demetro Warwick. Duvall Chemicals, LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019 - see doc #6 . (KWC)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Duvall Chemicals, LLC on 04/25/2019, filed by Demetro Warwick. (Williams, Sara)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeffery Allen Carroll and Duvall Chemicals, LLC, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 9th day of April, 2019. (JLC)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Demetro Warwick. filed by Demetro Warwick (Williams, Sara)
April 8, 2019 Filing Fee paid by Sara Leigh Williams in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3319075; USDC receipt number B4601096687; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Allen Carroll, Duvall Chemicals, LLC, filed by Demetro Warwick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Williams, Sara) Modified on 4/9/2019 (KWC)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/8/2019. (KWC)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Allen Carroll, Duvall Chemicals, LLC, filed by Demetro Warwick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warwick v. Carroll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetro Warwick
Represented By: Sara Leigh Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Allen Carroll
Represented By: Jason Digges Darneille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duvall Chemicals, LLC
Represented By: Jason Digges Darneille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?