Arnold v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Derrick Arnold
Defendant: State of Alabama, Andrew Mark Skier, Talladega County Circuit Court and Steve Giddens
Case Number: 1:2019cv00636
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Eastern Office
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to mail a copy of this Order and a copy of the #8 Order re Notice of Deficient Pleading to the plaintiff at the Bullock Correctional Facility. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order to comply with the Notice of Deficient Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/14/2019. (JLC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Refused. Mail sent to Derrick Arnold re #8 Order. (JLC)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING; Plaintiff's pleading is deficient for the reasons indicated. Plaintiff must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order in the manner explained herein. Plaintiff is also NOTIFIED that the Court will not consider any request for release from custody in this action, he must file a separate Habeas Petition to seek such relief. Only Plaintiff's claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, and any appropriate relief there under will be dealt with in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(JLC)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00062. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 29, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the #5 Recommendation is ADOPTED and that this case is TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of AL under 28 USC 1404. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
March 26, 2019 No objections filed to #5 report and recommendation (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 USC 1404; Objections to R&R due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/28/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION: it is ORDERED that the #3 motion for change of venue be STRICKEN from the docket and returned to Plf so he may file the motion in the appropriate state court. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 2/6/2019.(alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S #4 ORDER) MOTION for Change of Venue by Derrick Arnold. (alm, ) Modified on 2/6/2019 (alm, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Derrick Arnold. (es, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #1 Declaration) (alm, ). Modified on 2/4/2019 to add the declaration in support. (alm, ).[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Steve Giddens, Andrew Mark Skier, State of Alabama, Talladega County Circuit Court, filed by Derrick Arnold.(es, ) Modified to correct defendant Andrew Mark Skier and Steven Giddens names which were entered incorrectly (qc'd/es ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. State of Alabama et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mark Skier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talladega County Circuit Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?