Lasecki v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Lasecki
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00867
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brenda Lasecki. Midland Credit Management Inc waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (Hubbard, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brenda Lasecki. Midland Funding LLC waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (Hubbard, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3362559 (B4601098226). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Lasecki.(MRR, ). (Hubbard, John) Modified on 6/6/2019 (MRR, ).
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Lasecki.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lasecki v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Jason B Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Inc
Represented By: Jason B Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lasecki
Represented By: John C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?