Jones v. Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Denise Jones
Defendant: Jaimie Johnson, Larry Stone and Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind
Case Number: 1:2019cv00893
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind. (Carr, Clay)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed All Defendants. (SRD)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants del to USM (SRD)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/12/2019. (SRD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases (SRD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for appointment of counsel and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Denise Jones. (KEK)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind, Jaimie Johnson, Larry Stone, filed by Michelle Denise Jones. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Charge & letter, #2 Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Institute for the Deaf and Blind
Represented By: Clay R Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Denise Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?