Swain v. Imerys USA Inc
Plaintiff: Orthaniel Dell Swain
Defendant: Imerys USA Inc and Imerys Carbonates USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00983
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Imerys Carbonates USA, Inc..(McCarthy, Terrence)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Imerys Carbonates USA, Inc., filed by Orthaniel Dell Swain.(Evans, Daniel)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #7 motion for leave to file an amended complaint correcting the name of the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 08/16/19. (SUH)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Orthaniel Dell Swain. (Evans, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has an additional 21 days to file a pleading in response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 07/26/19. (SUH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Motion is RIPE 7/25/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Imerys USA Inc. (Vague, Amie)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Orthaniel Dell Swain. Imerys USA Inc served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (JLC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Imerys USA Inc. mailed certified mail (KAM)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3377643. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Imerys USA Inc, filed by Orthaniel Dell Swain.(KAM). (Evans, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Orthaniel Dell Swain. (KAM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Imerys USA Inc, filed by Orthaniel Dell Swain.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swain v. Imerys USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orthaniel Dell Swain
Represented By: Miles Clayborn Williams
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys USA Inc
Represented By: Amie Adelia Vague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Carbonates USA, Inc.
Represented By: Terrence W McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?