Narciso et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: H. N. and Sidney Jack Narciso
Defendant: Highland Health Services, Stacy Jackson, Melody Brooks Walker, Marsha Busby, Sandria V Narciso, LSA, Cleburne County Sheriff Department, Dr. Castro, Highland Health Center and Chris G McCary
Case Number: 1:2019cv01050
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is ORDERED to send paper copies of every document he has filed in this case to Defendant Sandria Narciso. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is NOT required to send copies to any other defendant. All defendants other than Sandria Narciso have been or will be served electronically. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/5/2019. (SRD)
September 4, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Melody Brooks Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Walker's appointments)(Albritton, Benjamin)
September 4, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Apology by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel by Sandria V Narciso. (JLC)
September 3, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Scott, Jr on behalf of Castro, Highland Health Services (Scott, William)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Stay #30 and hereby presently relieves the parties of their obligation to conduct a Rule 26 planning meeting. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff Narciso until September 27, 2019, to file ONE consolidated brief in opposition to these motions that complies with the Federal Rules. The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART Defendant Sandria Narciso's request for copies #34 by ORDERING all parties to mail a copy of the briefs ordered in Parts A and B to Ms. Narciso at the mailing address she has provided. Absent good cause shown, the Court also intends to withhold a ruling on any subsequently-filed motions until the Court considers the briefs ordered herein and rules on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/29/2019. (SRD)
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019. (SRD)
August 27, 2019 Filing 40 Answer and Objection to #27 Defendant Walker's Motion to Dismiss filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KEK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Highland Health Services. (Ronnlund, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Castro. (Ronnlund, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J Lane on behalf of Marsha Busby, Stacy Jackson (Lane, Joshua)
August 26, 2019 Filing 36 Answer and Objection to Defendant's #25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Correct Typos by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 26, 2019 Filing 34 Request for Copies from Plaintiff by Sandria V Narciso. (JLC)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. The Motion for Relief from Requirements of Initial Order #30 is hereby GRANTED. All obligations of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 or the initial order #21 are stayed until the Court rules on Defendants' pending motions to dismiss. Telephone Conference set for 8/28/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Corey L. Maze. Call-in information will be sent to the parties. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/23/2019. (cm pla)(SRD)
August 23, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER & OBJECTION re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KEK)
August 22, 2019 Filing 31 Objection to Defendant's #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Relief from Requirements of Initial Order or alternatively, Motion to Stay by LSA, Chris G McCary. (Stott, Joseph) Modified docket text only on 8/21/2019 (SRD).
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Sandria V Narciso. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER and Objections re #16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleading filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (KEK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by Melody Brooks Walker. (Albritton, Benjamin)
August 20, 2019 Filing 26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LSA, Chris G McCary. (Stott, Joseph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss by Cleburne County Sheriff Department. (Hill, C)
August 16, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LSA, Chris G McCary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - pages 1-24, #2 Exhibit "A" - pages 25-39)(Stott, Joseph)
August 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Access to Electronic Filing by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Suppress 2 per Exclusionary Rule by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/14/2019. (SRD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Interlocutory Order by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Suppress per Exclusionary Rule by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment 28 U.S.C. 2201 by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filings by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleading by Marsha Busby, Stacy Jackson. (Schlenker, Jonathan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S Schlenker on behalf of Marsha Busby, Stacy Jackson (Schlenker, Jonathan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Jack Narciso. Marsha Busby served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Sandria V Narciso served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Melody Brooks Walker served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (JLC)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 ex-parte Motion for Interlocutory Order filed by Sidney Jack Narciso; the Court hereby STRIKES the newly filed partially redacted ex-parte Motion for Interlocutory Order and ORDERS that it be filed under seal. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Narciso to re-file his motion with all pictures and other identifying information redacted as set out within. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 8/7/2019. (SRD)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 ***STRICKEN*** Redacted MOTION for order by Sidney Jack Narciso. (KAM) ***Stricken pursuant to Order #13 on 8/7/2019 (SRD).
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H. N.. Castro served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Cleburne County Sheriff Department served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; Melody Brooks Walker served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (KAM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Jack Narciso. Stacy Jackson served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (KAM)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 ex-parte MOTION for Interlocutory Order filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. The Court shall treat Narciso's filing as a motion to file under seal and hereby ORDERS that the July 30th filing (doc. 8) shall be filed under seal.The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff Narciso to re-file his motion with all pictures and other identifying information redacted. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/30/2019. (SRD)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 EX-PARTE MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY ORDER by Sidney Jack Narciso. (SRD)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. LSA served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Chris G McCary served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (KEK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants delivered to USMS for service. (SRD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. This Order supersedes all previous orders. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION (Request) for Reconsideration of In-Forma Pauperis Application re 3 Order by Sidney Jack Narciso. (SRD)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, but the required filing fee is hereby reduced to $100 on account of Plaintiff's limited financial resources. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/15/19. (SAM1)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KWC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (redacted) with Appendices 1 and 2 attached, against Marsha Busby, Castro, Cleburne County Sheriff Department, Highland Health Services, Stacy Jackson, LSA, Chris G McCary, Sandria V Narciso, Melody Brooks Walker, filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(KWC) (Additional attachment added on 7/8/2019: #2 Sealed Complaint- due to minor child's name) (KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narciso et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Health Services
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Represented By: William A Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Jackson
Represented By: Joshua J Lane
Represented By: Jonathan S Schlenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Brooks Walker
Represented By: Benjamin H Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Busby
Represented By: Joshua J Lane
Represented By: Jonathan S Schlenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandria V Narciso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSA
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleburne County Sheriff Department
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Castro
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Represented By: William A Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Health Center
Represented By: Robert M Ronnlund
Represented By: William A Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris G McCary
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Jack Narciso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?