Lawrence v. Arby's Inc
Plaintiff: Bertha Lawrence
Defendant: Arby's Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01141
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bertha Lawrence. For the reasons stated within, this case is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Talladega County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 9/5/2019. (SRD)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO TRANSFER by Arby's Inc re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Gambacurta, Virginia) Modified docket text only on 9/4/2019 (SRD).
September 4, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2019. (SRD)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bertha Lawrence. filed by Bertha Lawrence (Roy, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER Telephone Status Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM. Call in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/28/2019. (SRD)
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Status Conference held on 8/28/2019. (SRD)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bertha Lawrence. (Roy, Douglas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia F Gambacurta on behalf of Arby's Inc (Gambacurta, Virginia)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL before Judge Corey L. Maze. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/20/2019. (SRD)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Darby, Hannah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Rebekah Darby on behalf of Arby's Inc (Darby, Hannah)
July 24, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601099340 (SRD)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Arby's Inc (SRD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate of Removal by Arby's Inc (SRD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Arby's Inc.(SRD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Arby's Inc from Circuit Court of Talladega County, case number 61-CV-2019-900297, filed by Arby's Inc.(Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence v. Arby's Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arby's Inc
Represented By: Glenn E Ireland
Represented By: Virginia F Gambacurta
Represented By: Hannah Rebekah Darby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Lawrence
Represented By: Douglas M Roy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?