Jenkins v. Nash
Petitioner: James Jenkins
Respondent: Cheron Nash
Case Number: 1:2019cv01505
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/23/2019. (JLC)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Cheron Nash. (Long, Don)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; It is hereby ORDERED that the Respondents APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within twenty (20) calendar days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/30/2019. (JLC)
September 20, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601100724. (JLC)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - This pro se petition, filed by James Jenkins, is deficient for the reason(s) indicated below. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order. Petitioner failed to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or to pay the filing fee of $5.00. Petitioner must either file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee of $5.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/13/2019. (KEK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cheron Nash
Represented By: Don B Long, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?