Storey v. NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Storey
Defendant: NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, Deborah West and NHC Place/Anniston LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01748
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Janine McKinnon McAdory on behalf of John Storey (McAdory, Janine)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Allen Wright on behalf of John Storey (Wright, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3468310, NDAL receipt #B4601101671. (Carroll, Hunter) Modified on 10/31/2019 (JLC).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 10/30/2019. (SRD)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum Brief in Support Thereof by NHC Place/Anniston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Hunter)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum Brief in Support Thereof by Deborah West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carroll, Hunter)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, MOTION to Dismiss by NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, NHC Place/Anniston LLC, Deborah West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carroll, Hunter)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, NHC Place/Anniston LLC, Deborah West. filed by NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, NHC Place/Anniston LLC, Deborah West (Carroll, Hunter)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, Deborah West, NHC Place/Anniston LLC from Circuit Court of Calhoun County, Alabama, case number 11-cv-2019-900717, filed by NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC, Deborah West, NHC Place/Anniston LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storey v. NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHC Healthcare/Anniston LLC
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah West
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHC Place/Anniston LLC
Represented By: Hunter C Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Storey
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Represented By: Janine McKinnon McAdory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?