Vinson et al v. Extreme Products Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Vinson and Thomas E Vinson
Defendant: Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company Inc, KKR, Academy Ltd, Extreme Products Group LLC, Academy Ltd doing business as Academy Sports & Outdoors and KKR & Co Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00321
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company Inc re #11 Order to Show Cause, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Declaration of Susan Sessions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- Declaration of Christopher Lee, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C -- Glenn Griffin)(Gresham, Cole)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt Abbott on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Abbott, Matt)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER For the reasons stated within, the court ORDERS KKR to show cause as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Specifically, KKR SHALL electronically file the identity and citizenship of all Defendants in accordance with the rules set forth within by May 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/8/2020. (SRD)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER Extreme Products Group, LLC has filed an Amended Motion to Dismiss (doc. #7 ). Accordingly, the court finds Extreme Products Group, LLCs original Motion to Dismiss (doc. #3 ) is MOOT and directs the Clerk to terminate that motion. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/8/2020. (SRD)
April 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 4/7/2020. (SRD)
March 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Oscar Vann on behalf of Extreme Products Group LLC (Vann, Dennis)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 Brief re #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Extreme Products Group LLC. (Richmond, Lea)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Extreme Products Group LLC. (Richmond, Lea)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER This case is set for a telephone conference on April 7, 2020 at 3:00 PM. Plaintiff's obligations to respond to any Motions to Dismiss are STAYED until the telephone conference. All other deadlines in this case remain in place. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether the court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action during the call. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel of record. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 3/20/2020. (SRD)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/13/2020. (SRD)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Extreme Products Group LLC. (Richmond, Lea)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Extreme Products Group LLC. (Richmond, Lea)
March 9, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3553402 (ALND reciept# B4601104700). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 17-CV-2019-900056.00, filed by Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(SRD). (Gresham, Cole) Modified on 3/10/2020 (AKD).
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company Inc (SRD)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County, case number 17-CV-2019-900056.00, filed by Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vinson et al v. Extreme Products Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohlberg Kravis Roberts & Company Inc
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Ltd
Represented By: John Emory Rollins
Represented By: J Burruss Riis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Products Group LLC
Represented By: Dennis Oscar Vann
Represented By: Lea Richmond, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy Ltd doing business as Academy Sports & Outdoors
Represented By: John Emory Rollins
Represented By: J Burruss Riis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KKR & Co Inc
Represented By: Cole Robinson Gresham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Vinson
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Represented By: Janine McKinnon McAdory
Represented By: Matt Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Vinson
Represented By: Richard Allen Wright
Represented By: Janine McKinnon McAdory
Represented By: Matt Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?