Taylor v. Starr et al
Plaintiff: Robert Edward Taylor, Jr.
Defendant: Eric Starr, Southern Health Partners, Inc. and Latonya Chames
Case Number: 1:2020cv00489
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 Alias Summons Issued as to Southern Health Partners, Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 1st day of June, 2020. (JLC)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Edward Taylor, Jr. (Crow, Michael)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Taylor shall have until June 1, 2020 to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #5 and supporting brief #6 . Plaintiff's brief shall not exceed 15 pages, double-spaced, 14-point font. Defendants may file a reply brief by June 15, 2020, which shall not exceed 10 pages, double-spaced, 14-point font. This briefing order does not obviate the parties' requirements under the initial order #8 . Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on May 14, 2020. (Maze, Corey)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/13/2020. (SRD)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Latonya Chames, Eric Starr.(McNeill, J)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Brief re #1 Complaint filed by Latonya Chames, Eric Starr. (McNeill, J)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Latonya Chames, Eric Starr. (McNeill, J)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Edward Taylor, Jr. Latonya Chames served on 4/20/2020 (no date on green card), answer due 5/11/2020. (MRR, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, sent via certified mail (MRR, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Robert Edward Taylor, Jr. (Crow, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3572466 (B4601105390). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Edward Taylor, Jr.(SRD). (Crow, Michael) Modified on 4/14/2020 (MRR, ).
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert Edward Taylor, Jr.(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Starr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Starr
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Health Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latonya Chames
Represented By: J Randall McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Edward Taylor, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?