Crum v. Resolute Forest Products
Plaintiff: Fred Crum
Defendant: Resolute Forest Products
Case Number: 1:2020cv00550
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily J. Gelhaus filed by Resolute Forest Products and #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G. Rosenthal filed by Resolute Forest Products. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/14/20. (SAC)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Crum. Resolute Forest Products served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (KEK)
May 12, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3588802 (ALND B4601105921). (Miller, Shannon) Modified on 5/12/2020 (KEK).
May 12, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3588791 (ALND B4601105920). (Miller, Shannon) Modified on 5/12/2020 (KEK).
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily J. Gelhaus by Resolute Forest Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Shannon)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G. Rosenthal by Resolute Forest Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Miller, Shannon)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resolute Forest Products. filed by Resolute Forest Products (Miller, Shannon)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Resolute Forest Products.(Miller, Shannon)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Resolute Forest Products. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Plaintiff Fred Crum has moved to proceed in forma pauperis. (Doc. #2 ). The court finds that Mr. Crum is indigent, and GRANTS the motion. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to file this action without prepayment of a fee. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/23/2020. (KEK)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fred Crum. (KEK)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Resolute Forest Products, filed by Fred Crum.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum v. Resolute Forest Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute Forest Products
Represented By: Shannon L Miller
Represented By: Daniel G. Rosenthal
Represented By: Emily J Gelhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?