Northard v. Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC
Plaintiff: Tina Northard
Defendant: Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00559
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC. Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/27/2020. (Schach, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3578055 (ALND receipt# B4601105559). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC, filed by Tina Northard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(MRR, ). (Leonard, Heather) Modified on 4/24/2020 (AKD).
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Tina Northard. (MRR, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC, filed by Tina Northard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northard v. Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Northard
Represented By: Heather N Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Ingredients Technology Company LLC
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?