Crumbley et al v. Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC
Plaintiff: Thomas A Crumbley and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00603
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL ORDER - This matter comes before the court on Plaintiffs' Thomas Crumbley and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company's "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal," in which they seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims of the complaint. (Doc. #6 ). The court can discern no legal prejudice the defendant will suffer if the court grants the motion. Accordingly, the court GRANTS the motion to voluntarily dismiss the case and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all remaining claims. (Doc. #6 ). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/4/2020. (KEK)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Thomas A Crumbley. filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Thomas A Crumbley (Bazemore, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company (Bazemore, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas A Crumbley, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (KEK)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Thomas A Crumbley. (Bazemore, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3582020. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC, filed by Thomas A Crumbley, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(KEK). (Bazemore, Thomas)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC, filed by Thomas A Crumbley, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crumbley et al v. Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warrior Restoration and Environmental LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A Crumbley
Represented By: Hillary Kathryn Fisher
Represented By: Thomas E Bazemore, III
Represented By: Gordon J Brady, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Hillary Kathryn Fisher
Represented By: Thomas E Bazemore, III
Represented By: Gordon J Brady, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?