Turner v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christie Turner
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00876
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 53 FINAL JUDGMENT - Consistent with the accompanying memorandum opinion, the court ENTERS JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW in favor Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson and against Plaintiff Christie Turner on Counts One through Nine and Fourteen. Because Ms. Turner has conceded Counts Ten through Thirteen and Fifteen (see Doc. #50 ), there are no remaining claims in this action. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/29/2020. (KEK)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Because Ms. Turner's remaining claims (Counts One through Nine and Fourteen) are barred by the applicable two-year statute of limitations, the court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary (doc. #19 ) as to those claims and WILL ENTER JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW in favor of Defendants and against Ms. Turner on those claims. Because the court need not reach the merits of Ms. Turner's claims, the court DENIES as MOOT Defendants' motion to strike Ms. Turner's expert designation, or in the alternative, to exclude Dr. Webster's testimony. (Doc. #21 ). The court will enter a separate final judgment consistent with this memorandum opinion and order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/29/2020. (KEK)
July 24, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE to re #48 Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Christie Turner. (Hernandez, Cristina)
July 24, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE by Christie Turner Identifying Claims Conceded (Hernandez, Cristina)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: Consistent with the discussion during a July 16, 2020 telephone conference in this matter, on or before July 24, 2020, Ms. Turner may respond to Defendants' notice of supplemental authority (see Doc. #48 ). Any response shall include only relevant supplemental authority on the statute of limitations issue that was not available on or before January 4, 2020, when she filed her response in opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment. The response should not re-argue the statute of limitations issue or cite authority that was available to Ms. Turner before she filed her response in opposition to the motion for summary judgment. In addition, to the extent Ms. Turner concedes any of her claims, on or before July 24, 2020, Ms. Turner shall file a notice identifying those claims by count number. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/16/2020. (KEK)
July 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2020. Present: C. Hernandez, C. James, II, and C. Berdy. (SAC)
July 16, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3630927 (ALND B4601107205). (James, Charles) Modified on 7/16/2020 (KEK).
July 16, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berdy, Christopher)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for July 16, 2020, 1:00 PM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. The parties will receive the numbers required to join the call via e-mail. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/14/20. (SAC)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #45 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Christina Yadira Hernandez contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 3 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/13/20.(SAC)
July 13, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christie Turner. (James, Charles)
July 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles James, II on behalf of Christie Turner (James, Charles)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to withdraw Susan Robinson and William Gage as their counsel of record. (Doc. #42 ). Christopher Berdy and Caroline Walker will continue to represent Defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/24/2020. (KEK)
June 24, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Susan M. Robinson and William M. Gage by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Berdy, Christopher)
June 24, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Berdy on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Berdy, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01551. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 21, 2020 Filing 39 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 38 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (9051) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 37 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (9061) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 36 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (4328) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (4329) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4551) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8953) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (9066) -Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Marshall Shoemaker)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 35 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2076) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2098) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2140) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2253) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Terri Longacre, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8939) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (9054) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Teri Longacre)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (8561) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (8561) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8561) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8564) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8655) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8933) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (9038) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Charles Hanes)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 33 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8925) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (9070) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 32 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2436) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2436) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2441) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2555) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2619) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3663) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3666) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3792) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3814) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8978) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (9010) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Paul Michaels)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 31 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8976) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (9009) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 30 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #29 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2038) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2040) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2213) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3588) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3589) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3758) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (3840) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (8985) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (9001) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 29 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Emails, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/22/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 6/21/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/8/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Cases Filed After PTO #304 Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/5/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #24 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #23 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
January 4, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM by Christie Turner in opposition to #19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment on all claims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE by Christie Turner in opposition to #21 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike Expert Designation, or Alternatively, MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Scott Webster, M.D. (Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #21 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike Expert Designation, or Alternatively, to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Scott Webster, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike Expert Designation, or Alternatively, to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of W. Scott Webster, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. W. Scott Webster on January 22, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. CST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. W. Scott Webster on December 12, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. CST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Christie Turner. (Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Christie Turner. (Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Jeffrey Collins on 12/09/2019 at 4:30 p.m. CDT (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #11 Response In Opposition. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Christie Turner in opposition to #6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Cases Filed After PTO #304 Without Prejudice. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit)(Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christie Turner on December 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Christie Turner on December 3, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. CST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline Dye Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss Cases Filed After PTO #304 Without Prejudice. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christie Turner for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Hernandez, Cristina) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER # 346 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The Pretrial Order # 341 is AMENDED to correct a typographical error in Paragraph A (Scheduling Deadlines); the court has removed cases from the original Exhibit A that have since closed; the remaining provisions related to Wave 13 remain in effect and are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRETRIAL ORDER # 341 (Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The court ORDERS as follows for the cases on Exhibit A: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for placement or return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from these scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent any other defendants are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; and (3) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 13 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 13 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 07/01/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 07/11/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 08/09/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 10/08/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/07/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/14/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 12/13/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 12/20/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 01/10/2020. Filing of Daubert motions due by 12/20/2020. Responses to Daubert motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 01/10/2020. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due by 11/4/2019, and any response is due by 11/18/2019. Any reply is due by 11/25/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no late than 11/5/2019, and are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 11/15/2019. The Clerk is directed to remove any existing wave or inactive flags from the cases on Exhibit A and place the Ethicon Wave 13 flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 13 cases on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 324 (Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund - Fitzgerald Law Group, LLC) entered on 11/30/2018 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7008531. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Turner
Represented By: Cristina Yadira Hernandez
Represented By: Charles James, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Caroline Dye Walker
Represented By: Christopher S Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?