Steadman et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Susan Steadman and James L Steadman
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00905
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Accordingly, this court ORDERS the Steadmans to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before August 27, 2020, why the court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/20/2020. (KEK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Exhibits to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Harris, Paula)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nationstar Mortgage LLC NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC D/B/A MR. COOPER'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Edwards, Erin)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/4/20. (SAC)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America NA. filed by Bank of America NA (Gerhardt, Graham)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Angelique Harris on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harris, Paula)
July 31, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3640534 (ALND B4601107455). (Edwards, Erin) Modified on 7/31/2020 (KEK).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS #8 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for attorney Erin Edwards contingent upon payment of the $75.00 pro hac vice fee within 7 days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/30/20. (SAC)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Emmons, Carl)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear APPLICATION FOR ERIN E. EDWARDS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Erin)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. #6 ). A responsive pleading is due on or before July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/27/2020. (KEK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Emmons, Carl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bank of America NA.(Gerhardt, Graham)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Steadman, James L Steadman. Bank of America NA served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (KEK)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Steadman, James L Steadman. Nationstar Mortgage LLC served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (AKD)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bank of America NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
June 29, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3618944 (ALND B4601106807) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed by Susan Steadman, James L Steadman.(KEK). (Robinson, Charles) Modified on 6/29/2020 (KEK).
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America NA, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, filed by Susan Steadman, James L Steadman.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steadman et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Steadman
Represented By: Charles E Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Paula Angelique Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Steadman
Represented By: Charles E Robinson, Jr
Represented By: Paula Angelique Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Carl Joseph Emmons
Represented By: Erin Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Graham W Gerhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?