Paseur v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Andrew Paseaur and Andrew Paseur
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01189
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT within 60 days from the date of this order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/2/20. (MRR, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- The warden shall withhold and deduct twenty percent of the plaintiff's monthly deposits until a total of $296.12 has been withheld and paid to the Clerk of Court to satisfy the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 10/2/20. (MRR, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Andrew Paseur (MRR, )
September 30, 2020 Initial Filing fee: $ 53.88, receipt number B4601108761 (MRR, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The pltf is ORDERED to pay the initial filing fee of $53.88 and to make monthly payments until the entire filing fee is paid in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 9/2/20. (MRR, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Paseur. (MRR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2020: #1 Envelope) (MRR, ).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- The pltf must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/21/20. (MRR, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Andrew Paseur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/21/2020 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paseur v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Paseaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Paseur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?