Bice v. United Parcel Service Inc
Plaintiff: Darrell Bice
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01435
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER The Court hereby GRANTS #6 the defendant's motion for extension of time to file a report of parties' planning meeting. The report must now be filed by December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 11/20/2020. (SRD)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time for Deadline to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by United Parcel Service Inc. (Miller, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Harmon on behalf of Darrell Bice (Harmon, Thomas)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/29/2020. (SRD)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service Inc.(Ross, Brett)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service Inc. filed by United Parcel Service Inc (Miller, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3680413 (ALND receipt# B4601108684). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service Inc from Circuit Court of Calhoun County, case number 11-cv-2020-900459.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(SRD). (Miller, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/28/2020 (AKD).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Parcel Service Inc from Circuit Court of Calhoun County, case number 11-cv-2020-900459.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bice v. United Parcel Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey G Miller
Represented By: Brett A Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bice
Represented By: Thomas W Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?