Armbrester et al v. City of Lincoln Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Candas Baker and Justin Armbrester
Defendant: City of Lincoln Alabama doing business as Lincoln Fire & Rescue, Alabama Medicaid Agency, Birmingham Radiological Group PC, Island Medical Troy Alabama LLC, TriMed Billing Solutions LLC, United States of America Department of Health and Human Services, BBH CBMC LLC doing business as Citizens Baptist Medical Center and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00203
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by Erin Ganey Adams (Adams, Erin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BBH CBMC LLC, City of Lincoln Alabama, United Healthcare Services, Inc. (SRD)
March 31, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Entry of Default by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
March 26, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Alias Summons and Amended Complaint served on Birmingham Radiological Group on 03/24/2021, filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 28 Alias Summons Issued as to Birmingham Radiological Group PC., returned to plaintiff for service (MRR, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. Island Medical Troy Alabama LLC served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (MEB2)
March 19, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. Alabama Medicaid Agency served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (MEB2)
March 18, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker as to Birmingham Radiological Group PC. (MEB2)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: the court GRANTS Defendant United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services' (DHHS) second unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond #20 . DHHS will have until May 3, 2021 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/18/2021. (SRD)
March 18, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 3/18/2021. (SRD)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for Thursday, March 18, 2021 at 10:30 AM to discuss Doc. #20 . Counsel are to call 877-873-8018 and enter access code 6714714. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/15/2021. (SRD)
March 15, 2021 Filing 22 ALIAS Summons Issued as to TriMed Billing Solutions LLC. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
March 15, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by TriMed Billing Solutions LLC.(Clayton, Jerry)
March 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by United States of America Department of Health and Human Services Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Richardson, Clinton)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Medicaid. Medicaid is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/12/2021. (SRD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. BBH CBMC LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (MEB2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. City of Lincoln Alabama served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (MEB2)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to TriMed Billing Solutions, LLC by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (MEB2)
March 3, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Alabama Medicaid Agency, BBH CBMC LLC, Birmingham Radiological Group PC, City of Lincoln Alabama, Island Medical Troy Alabama LLC, TriMed Billing Solutions LLC. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Interpleader Defendant by Alabama Medicaid Agency. (White, Samuel)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Request for service by certified mail filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #9 Entry of Default by the Clerk as premature. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/1/2021. (SRD)
February 26, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. United Healthcare Services, Inc. served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (MEB2)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Alias Summons and Complaint served on Birmingham Radiological Group on 02/23/2021, filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Defendants City of Lincoln, Alabama, d/b/a Lincoln Fire & Rescue, BBH CBMC, LLC, d/b/a Citizens Baptist Medical Center, Island Medical Troy Alabama, LLC, Trimed Billing Solutions, LLC, and Alabama Medicaid Agency by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin) Modified docket text only on 2/22/2021 (SRD).
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Alabama Medicaid Agency on 01/19/2021, filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Birmingham Radiological Group PC. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: the court GRANTS Defendant United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services' Motion for Extension of Time #3 . Their responsive pleading is now due by March 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 2/16/2021. (SRD)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United Healthcare Services, Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Request for service by certified mail filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker. (Adams, Erin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by United States of America Department of Health and Human Services. (Richardson, Clinton)
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Justin Armbrester, Candas Baker.(Adams, Erin)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America Department of Health and Human Services from Circuit Court of Talladega County, case number 61-cv-2021-900014.00. (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armbrester et al v. City of Lincoln Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lincoln Alabama doing business as Lincoln Fire & Rescue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Medicaid Agency
Represented By: Samuel Morgan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Radiological Group PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Medical Troy Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TriMed Billing Solutions LLC
Represented By: Jerry Adam Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBH CBMC LLC doing business as Citizens Baptist Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candas Baker
Represented By: Steven M Mezrano
Represented By: Erin Ganey Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Armbrester
Represented By: Steven M Mezrano
Represented By: Erin Ganey Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?