BWW Inc v. Brigham et al
Plaintiff: BWW Inc doing business as SERVPRO of Birmingham
Defendant: James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth and David Thompson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00470
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth, David Thompson. (Morse, Wayne)
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BWW Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Smith, Bradley)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER GRANTING unopposed motion for extension of time #14 . Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is now due on May 21, 2021. Defendants' reply, if any, is due on May 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 5/11/2021. (KEK)
May 11, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 5/21/2021; Replies due by 5/28/2021. (KEK)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Response in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION to Dismiss by BWW Inc. (Smith, Bradley)
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J Smith on behalf of BWW Inc (Smith, Bradley)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER GRANTING motion to stay discovery and rule 26 obligations #10 . The court hereby STAYS the parties' deadlines under Rule 26 pending its ruling on Defendants' motion to dismiss #8 . Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 5/5/2021. (SRD)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall have until Friday, May 14, 2021 to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss #8 and supporting brief #9 . Plaintiff's brief shall not exceed 25 pages, double-spaced, 14-point font. Defendants may file a reply brief by Friday, May 21, 2021, which shall not exceed 10 pages, double-spaced, 14-point font. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/30/2021. (SRD)
April 29, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Discovery and Rule 26 Obligations Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth, David Thompson. (Morse, Wayne)
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth, David Thompson. (Morse, Wayne)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth, David Thompson. (Morse, Wayne)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to re #3 Motion to Show Cause Order filed by BWW Inc. (Hair, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BWW Inc. Don C Killingsworth served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Hair, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BWW Inc. David Thompson served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Hair, Barry)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BWW Inc. James Brigham served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Hair, Barry)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not dismiss Defendants A-Z from this action. Show Cause Response due by 4/22/2021. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 4/8/2021. (SRD)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James Brigham, Don C Killingsworth, David Thompson. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
April 2, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3810660 (B4601112393). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BWW Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (SRD). (Smith, Bradley) Modified on 4/2/2021 (MEB2).
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BWW Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (SRD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BWW Inc v. Brigham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BWW Inc doing business as SERVPRO of Birmingham
Represented By: Barry W Hair
Represented By: Bradley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brigham
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don C Killingsworth
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Thompson
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?