Embry v. Carrington Mortgage Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donna R Embry
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Case Number: 1:2022cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #21 the plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to amend her complaint. The plaintiff shall file her amended compliant by March 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 3/4/2022. (SRD)
March 3, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint by Donna R Embry. (Lay, Kenneth)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #19 the plaintiff's motion for extension of time to amend the Complaint. The plaintiff's Amended Complaint is now due March 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 2/25/2022. (KEK)
February 24, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend complaint by Donna R Embry. (Lay, Kenneth)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery 7/29/2022. Telephone Conference set for 8/2/2022 09:00 AM. Motions 9/16/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 01:30 PM in US Courthouse, Anniston, AL. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 2/15/2022. (SRD)
February 15, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L. Maze: Telephone Conference held on 2/15/2022. (SRD)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The court sets a telephone scheduling conference for February 15, 2022 at 1:30 PM. Counsel should call (877) 873-8018 and use access code 6714714 to participate. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 2/8/2022. (SRD)
February 7, 2022 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bottcher, Christopher)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for More Definite Statement. For the reasons stated in Chase's motion for a more definite statement, the court finds that Embry's Complaint is a shotgun pleading and GRANTS Chase's motion for a more definite statement. The court ORDERS Embry to file an Amended Complaint that adheres to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure/Eleventh Circuit precedent and that only contains claims that are cognizable under the law. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 2/3/2022. (SRD)
February 1, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for More Definite Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hess, Joshua)
January 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Vann Walker on behalf of Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Walker, Natalie)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 1/12/2022. (KEK)
January 11, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC. filed by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC (Bottcher, Christopher)
January 11, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB (Bottcher, Christopher)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #8 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Chase shall respond by February 1, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/6/2022. (SRD)
January 5, 2022 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Hess, Joshua)
January 5, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R Hess on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank (Hess, Joshua)
January 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Collins on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank (Collins, John)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank. filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank (Hess, Joshua)
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase Bank Consent to Removal (Hess, Joshua)
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal. (Bottcher, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB.(Bottcher, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB from Circuit Court of Talladega County, case number 61-CV-2021-900375.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(SRD)
January 4, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3988714 (ALND B4601117754) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB from Circuit Court of Talladega County, case number 61-CV-2021-900375.00. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(SRD). (Bottcher, Christopher) Modified on 1/5/2022 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Embry v. Carrington Mortgage Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna R Embry
Represented By: Kenneth J Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Natalie Vann Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Joshua R Hess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Christopher A Bottcher
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Natalie Vann Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?