Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc et al v. Masonry Arts Inc et al
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company and BL Harbert International LLC
Counter Defendant: Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc
Counter Claimant: Masonry Arts Inc
Case Number: 1:2022cv01487
Filed: November 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Counterclaim OF MASONRY ARTS, INC. by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity).(Erskine, Tamera)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant B.L. Harbert International, LLC #14 . The parties are REMINDED to brief the Motion in accordance with Exhibit B to the courts Initial Order #10 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/19/2023. (KAM)
January 18, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by BL Harbert International LLC. (Hill, James)
January 17, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BL Harbert International LLC. filed by BL Harbert International LLC (Hill, James)
January 9, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Masonry Arts Inc. filed by Masonry Arts Inc (Heath, Robert)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Fidelity Insurance Company. filed by International Fidelity Insurance Company (Heath, Robert)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/5/2023. (KAM)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Masonry Arts Inc.(Heath, Robert)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by International Fidelity Insurance Company.(Heath, Robert)
December 27, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity) as to Masonry Arts Inc. (KAM)
December 27, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America). International Fidelity Insurance Company served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/2/2023. (KAM)
December 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity) as to BL Harbert International LLC. (KAM)
November 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BL Harbert International LLC, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Masonry Arts Inc. mailed certified mail. (KAM)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc, Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc. (Erskine, Tamera)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity). filed by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity) (Erskine, Tamera)
November 23, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4217080. related document #1 COMPLAINT against BL Harbert International LLC, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Masonry Arts Inc, filed by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KAM). (Erskine, Tamera) NDAL rec# B-2444 Modified on 11/28/2022 (KAM).
November 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BL Harbert International LLC, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Masonry Arts Inc, filed by Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(for the use and benefit of the United States of America), Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc(in its own capacity). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc et al v. Masonry Arts Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Midwest Cast Stone of Kansas Inc
Represented By: Tamera K Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Masonry Arts Inc
Represented By: Robert W Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BL Harbert International LLC
Represented By: James Jackson Hill, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?