Russell v. LEIDOS Inc et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Russell
Defendant: LEIDOS Inc, Mason Livesay Scientific LLC doing business as IB3 Global Solutions LLC, PACEM Defense LLC doing business as ALS Technologies, Defense Technology LLC and Anthony W Landingham
Case Number: 1:2023cv01488
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PACEM Defense LLC. filed by PACEM Defense LLC (Wilson, David)
December 14, 2023 Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by PACEM Defense LLC. (Wilson, David)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff Benjamin Russell (Russell)s Unopposed Motion to Stay Requirement Under Rule 26(f) pending the courts ruling on Defendant Anthony W. Landinghams Motion to Dismiss, (doc. 7), and Russells Motion to Remand, (doc. 9). (Doc. 21). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 12/12/2023. (LCB)
December 11, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Russell re: #23 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Benjamin Russell. (Clay, Calvin)
December 11, 2023 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by PACEM Defense LLC.(Wilson, David)
December 8, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE to re #16 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Anthony W Landingham. (Vercher, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEIDOS Inc. filed by LEIDOS Inc (Vercher, Michael)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney S Greg Burge terminated. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/5/2023. (AMC)
December 4, 2023 Filing 25 JOINDER in re #23 Motion in Support of Defense Technology's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by LEIDOS Inc. (Landers, Wilson)
December 4, 2023 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by LEIDOS Inc.(Landers, Wilson)
December 4, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand (Defendants' Consolidated Opposition) filed by Defense Technology LLC. (Goodman, John)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PACEM Defense LLC. (Burge, S)
December 4, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Requirement Under Rule 26(f) by Benjamin Russell. (Clay, Calvin)
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Michael Hearn on behalf of Mason Livesay Scientific LLC (Hearn, Charles)
December 1, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Cecil H Macoy, Jr on behalf of Mason Livesay Scientific LLC (Macoy, Cecil)
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mason Livesay Scientific LLC. filed by Mason Livesay Scientific LLC (Robinson, Ben)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mason Livesay Scientific LLC.(Robinson, Ben)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Benjamin Russell. (Clay, Calvin)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by PACEM Defense LLC (Wilson, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wilson on behalf of PACEM Defense LLC (Wilson, David)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendant PACEM Defense LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer, (doc. 11). PACEM Defense LLC's Answer is due on or before Monday, December 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/21/2023. (KAM)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff Benjamin Russell ("Russell")'s Motion to Remand, (doc. 9). Defendant Defense Technology LLC has on or before Monday, December 4, 2023, to file a consolidated response, in no more than 15 pages (double-spaced and size-14 font). Russell's Reply is due on or before Monday, December 11, 2023, and shall not exceed 15 pages (double-spaced and size-14 font). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/21/2023. (KAM)
November 20, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PACEM Defense LLC. (Burge, S)
November 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by S Greg Burge on behalf of PACEM Defense LLC (Burge, S)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Benjamin Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Clay, Calvin)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The court is in receipt of Defendant Landingham's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Russell's claims against him. Russell shall respond to the motion on or before Friday, December 1, 2023. Landingham's shall reply on or before Friday, December 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/17/2023. (LCB)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Anthony W Landingham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Vercher, Michael)
November 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Vercher on behalf of LEIDOS Inc (Vercher, Michael)
November 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Vercher on behalf of Anthony W Landingham (Vercher, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/3/2023. (LCB)
November 3, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4462554 (B-8306). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defense Technology LLC from Circuit Court of Calhoun County Alabama, case number 11-CV-2023-900441. filed by PACEM Defense LLC, Defense Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LCB). (Goodman, John)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defense Technology LLC. filed by Defense Technology LLC (Goodman, John)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defense Technology LLC.(Goodman, John)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defense Technology LLC from Circuit Court of Calhoun County Alabama, case number 11-CV-2023-900441. filed by PACEM Defense LLC, Defense Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(LCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. LEIDOS Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Russell
Represented By: C Carter Clay
Represented By: Calvin Carter Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIDOS Inc
Represented By: Michael A Vercher
Represented By: Wilson Murray Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Livesay Scientific LLC doing business as IB3 Global Solutions LLC
Represented By: Ben Bainbridge Robinson
Represented By: Cecil H Macoy, Jr
Represented By: Charles Michael Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACEM Defense LLC doing business as ALS Technologies
Represented By: S Greg Burge
Represented By: David M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Technology LLC
Represented By: Morgan Catherine Kain
Represented By: John M Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony W Landingham
Represented By: Michael A Vercher
Represented By: Wilson Murray Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?