Doe v. United States Air Force et al Featured Case

Plaintiff, a former Senior Intelligence Analyst for U.S. Special Forces, alleged that he was retaliated against and threatened with additional retaliation if he testified or provided evidence about his pre-9/11 warning about possible terrorist attacks by Bin Laden inside the United States and how he was being treated by the Air Force to Congress at the 9/11 Commission.

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Donald Rumsfeld, United States Air Force, James L Jones, Detula, F Przybyslawski, Michael W Wynne, Peter Pace and T Michael Mosley
Case Number: 2:2007cv00842
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2007 25
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Special Prosecutor by John Doe. (Bosarge, James)
October 29, 2007 24
Brief re20 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Ragland, Edward)
October 25, 2007 19
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Order Requiring Plaintiff to Proceed Using His Real Name filed by John Doe. (Bosarge, James)
October 19, 2007 18 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE any non-summary judgment motions filed after the entry of this order SHALL comply with the provisions of Exhibit B attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/19/2007. (KSS, )
October 17, 2007 17
MOTION for Order Requiring the Plaintiff to Proceed in this Litigation under his Real Name and Allowing the Defendants to Re-file unsealed copies of their previously submitted Memorandum of Law and Submission of Evidence (with the Plaintiff's Social Security Number redacted) by Peter Pace, T Michael Mosley, Detula, F Przybyslawski, James L Jones, Cheryl A Kerwin, United States Air Force, Donald Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne. (Ragland, Edward)
October 12, 2007 14
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for failure to State a Claim, or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by Peter Pace, T Michael Mosley, Detula, F Przybyslawski, James L Jones, Cheryl A Kerwin, United States Air Force, Donald Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne. (Ragland, Edward)
August 14, 2007 12
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General served on 8/13/2007, answer due 10/12/2007. (KSS, )
August 10, 2007 11
Summons Issued as to the United States Attorney General delivered to plaintiff. (KSS, )
August 6, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER reminding the plaintiff of his obligation to perfect service within the requisite time frame; Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/6/2007. (BST, )
July 23, 2007 9
RESPONSE to filed by John Doe. (Bosarge, James)
July 18, 2007 8
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the Office of the Attorney General served on 7/10/2007, answer due 9/10/2007. (KSS, )
July 6, 2007 6
CERTIFICATE of Counsel by James R Bosarge, Jr on behalf of John Doe. (KSS, )
May 30, 2007 5
AFFIDAVIT of Melinda J. Porter re: service of summons and complaint on dfts' by John Doe. (KSS, )
May 15, 2007 3
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to F Przybyslawski served on 5/10/2007, answer due 7/9/2007. (KSS, )
May 7, 2007 2
Summons Issued as to Peter Pace, T Michael Mosley, Detula, F Przybyslawski, James L Jones, Cheryl A Kerwin, United States Air Force, Donald Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne delivered to Plaintiff. (KSS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. United States Air Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Rumsfeld
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Jones
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detula
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F Przybyslawski
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Wynne
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pace
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Michael Mosley
Represented By: Edward Q Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: James R Bosarge, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?