Jensen v. Pfizer, Inc.

Plaintiff: Carol A. Jensen
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv02074
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Panel on Multidistrict Litigation - MDL No. 2092, Chantix (Varenicline) Products - the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of Alabama are transferred to the Northern District of Alabama a nd, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Inge P. Johnson for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in that district and listed on Schedule A. (case to be transferred upon receipt of certified copy of transfer order from USDC-Alabama) (ADB, ) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/14/2009.]
July 17, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay pending a ruling by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the MDL motions referenced by the parties, all activity in the instant action shall be stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, ) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/14/2009.]
July 15, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the defendant's Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with the Court's 4/20/09 Discovery Order 36 is held in abeyance pending the plaintiff's response to this order. The plaintiff shall have to on or before 7/22/09 to show cause why the plaintiff should not be compelled to produce a response using the Fact Sheet form provided by the defendant. Failure to comply with this order may be considered an abandonment of the plaintiff's opposition to the defendant's motion. The defendant shall have to on or before 7/27/09 to file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/14/2009.]
July 2, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, ) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/14/2009.]
April 20, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Status Report 29 filed by Pfizer, Inc. ; The Court hereby adopts the parties' Joint Coordinated Plan of Discovery submitted as Exhibit 1 to the parties Joint Status Report and Motion to Adopt Joint Discovery Plan [29-2]. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (PAV) [Transferred from Nebraska on 10/14/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol A. Jensen
Represented By: B. Kristian W. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?