Wilson v. The Birmingham Public Library Foundation et al Featured Case

Library assistant claims hostile work environment in a public library when library patrons view pornography. Also claims recipient of aggressive sexual comments and sexual touching.

Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Wilson
Defendant: The Birmingham Public Library Foundation and City of Birmingham, Alabama, The
Case Number: 2:2010cv02386
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The court, having been advised that a settlement has been reached, dismisses this case without prejudice to reinstatement if any party represents to the court on or before July 19, 2012, that final settlement documentation could not be completed. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/19/2012. (FNC)
April 18, 2012 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine by agreement of Defendants. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4-18-12. (AMW, )
April 18, 2012 58 Featured Case AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER with Exhibit A, attached. Jury trial set for Monday, April 23, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/18/2012. (FNC)
April 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karon O Bowdre: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/17/2012. (YMB)
April 11, 2012 NOTICE CHANGING TIME OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Final Pretrial Conference previously set for Tuesday, 4/17/2012, at 11:00 AM, is RESET for NOON, THAT SAME DATE, 5th floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. (YMB)
April 9, 2012 57 MOTION in Limine by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
April 9, 2012 56 MOTION in Limine by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
April 9, 2012 55 Proposed Voir Dire by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
April 9, 2012 54 Brief and Trial Submission filed by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
April 3, 2012 NOTICE RESETTING CONFERENCE: Due to a conflict with the court's calendar, the Final Pretrial Conference previously set for 4/12/12, is RESET for Tuesday, 4/17/2012, at 11:00 AM, 5th floor chambers, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. (YMB)
March 26, 2012 53 DAMAGE list of Barbara Ann Wilson filed.. (Morel, Adam)
March 23, 2012 52 Exhibit List by Barbara Ann Wilson.. (Morel, Adam)
March 23, 2012 51 Witness List by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
March 23, 2012 50 Witness List and Exhibit List by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
February 29, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 4/23/2012 09:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/29/2012. (FNC)
February 29, 2012 48 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER with Exhibit A, attached. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/29/2012. (FNC)
February 22, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER Setting Final Pretrial Conference for 4/12/2012 10:00 AM, fifth floor chambers, in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/22/2012. (FNC)
February 16, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karon O Bowdre: Pretrial Conference held on 2/16/2012. Written order to follow. (YMB)
February 10, 2012 46 Featured Case ORDER. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion 45 , filed contemporaneously with this Order, the court DENIES motion 31 . Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/10/2012. (FNC)
February 10, 2012 45 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/10/2012. (FNC)
January 26, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2012 10:00 AM, fifth floor chambers, before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2012. Jury Trial set for 4/23/2012 09:00 AM, Courtroom 5A, in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Motions terminated: 43 . Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/26/2012. (FNC)
January 24, 2012 43 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
January 9, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 2/2/2012 03:30 PM, fifth floor chambers in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Joint proposed pretrial order due on or before 1/27/2012. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/9/2012. (FNC)
October 3, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: The pretrial conference in this case has been moved from the October 28, 2011 pretrial docket to the January 27, 2012 pretrial docket. An order will be entered in early January assigning a specific time for this pretrial conference. (PRW)
September 2, 2011 41 RESPONSE in Support re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition of Robert Jones)(Fullerton, Frederic)
August 22, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 40 Defendants' Motion to Allow Additional Pages. Defendants' reply brief may not exceed 30 pages total. However, the court reminds counsel that a page limit is a maximum and not an aspirational goal. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/22/11. (JWT, )
August 22, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefs in Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply brief is due September 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/22/11. (JWT, )
August 22, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Additional Pages. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/17/11. (JWT, )
August 19, 2011 40 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
August 19, 2011 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
August 17, 2011 38 Evidentiary Material re: 37 Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Barbara Wilson, # 2 Exhibit Wilson EEOC Charge, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 28 to Blaylock Depo., # 4 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Blaylock Depo., # 5 Exhibit Depo. of Angela Hall, # 6 Exhibit Depo. of Barbara Clotfelter, # 7 Exhibit Depo. of Sandra Lee, # 8 Exhibit Depo. of Mike Lee, # 9 Exhibit Depo. of Edith Major, # 10 Exhibit Depo. of Dave Ryan, # 11 Exhibit Depo. of Barry Lollar)(Morel, Adam)
August 17, 2011 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTED filed by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
August 17, 2011 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
August 17, 2011 35 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
August 2, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension. Plaintiff's response to the Motion for Summary Judgment is due August 17, 2011. Defendant's reply, if needed, is due Augsut 31, 2011. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/2/11. (JWT, )
August 2, 2011 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
July 20, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re: 31 . The plaintiff's response will be due August 10, 2011. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due August 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 07/20/2011. (FNC)
July 20, 2011 32 Brief re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Wilson Deposition, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Blalock Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Blalock depo, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3a to Blalcock depo, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3b to Blalock depo, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Blalock depo, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Blalock depo, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7-20 to Blalock depo, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 21-27 to Blalock depo, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 29-32 to Blalock depo, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 33 to Blalock depo, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 34-36 to Blalock depo, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Lollar Deposition, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 4 City Code)(Fullerton, Frederic)
July 20, 2011 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
June 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karon O Bowdre: Status Conference held on 6/28/2011. (PRW)
June 28, 2011 30 NOTICE by Barbara Ann Wilson re 27 Status Report (Morel, Adam)
June 22, 2011 29 NOTICE by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The Objection to Audio Tapes in Depositions (Fullerton, Frederic)
June 20, 2011 28 NOTICE by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The Objection to Notices of Depositions (Fullerton, Frederic)
June 17, 2011 27 STATUS REPORT (Unilateral) by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
June 2, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Setting Status Conference for 6/28/2011 02:30 PM, fifth floor chambers in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Parties are reminded of the joint status report due June 20, 1011 per scheduling order (doc. 23). Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 06/02/2011. (FNC)
May 24, 2011 25 NOTICE by Barbara Ann Wilson of Objection to Notice of Deposition (Morel, Adam)
February 18, 2011 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Plaintiff must comply by February 28, 2011. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2-18-11. (AMW, )
February 15, 2011 24 MOTION to Compel by Birmingham Library Board, City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fullerton, Frederic)
December 7, 2010 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER : that certain deadlines and time limits apply as set out in this order. Discovery due by 7/1/2011; Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2011; Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2011; Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2011, fifth floor chambers in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL; Status Conference set for 6/24/2011 before Judge Karon O Bowdre. This case should be ready for trial by December, 2011. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/07/2010. (FNC)
November 23, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/2/2010 10:30 AM, fifth floor chambers in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL, as further set out herein, before Judge Karon O Bowdre. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/23/2010. (FNC)
November 23, 2010 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fullerton, Frederic)
November 16, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER : the court GRANTS the motion to dismiss 17 , DISMISSES all claims against Irene S. "Renee" Blaylock in her official and individual capacities, and dismisses Blaylock as a party Defendant. The lawsuit will proceed against the two remaining Defendants: the City of Birmingham, Alabama; and the Birmingham Library Board. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/16/2010. (FNC)
November 10, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER : The court GRANTS motion 13 and ORDERS that the Birmingham Public Library Foundation be DISMISSED as a party Defendant. The case will proceed against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/10/2010. (FNC)
November 3, 2010 18 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 17 . Plaintiff is to show cause in writing on or before November 10, 2010 why this motion should not be granted. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/03/2010. (FNC)
November 3, 2010 17 MOTION to Dismiss by Renee Blaylock. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fullerton, Frederic)
November 3, 2010 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Birmingham Library Board.(Fullerton, Frederic)
November 3, 2010 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Clarify or Correct Court Record. If the clerk of court has not already corrected the record, the court directs the clerk to do so. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11-3-10. (AMW, )
November 3, 2010 15 MOTION to clarify or correct court record by City of Birmingham, Alabama, The. (Fullerton, Frederic)
November 2, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 13 . The court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before November 9, 2010 why this motion should not be granted. If Plaintiff does not oppose this motion, she need not respond to this Order; the court will grant the motion after the deadline. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/02/2010. (FNC)
October 22, 2010 13 Second MOTION to Dismiss by The Birmingham Public Library Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Irene S. Blalock)(Fullerton, Frederic)
October 21, 2010 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Birmingham, Alabama, The, The Birmingham Public Library Foundation, filed by Barbara Ann Wilson.(Morel, Adam)
October 20, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER : The court DENIES 5 , FURTHER, the court GRANTS 10 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1), as further set out herein. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/20/2010. (FNC)
October 4, 2010 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Morel, Adam)
October 4, 2010 9 RESPONSE to re 7 filed by Barbara Ann Wilson. (Morel, Adam)
September 28, 2010 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Birmingham Public Library Foundation served on 9/27/2010, answer due 10/18/2010. (FNC)
September 20, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: 5 . Show Cause Response due by 10/4/2010. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/20/10. (FNC)
September 20, 2010 6 Featured Case ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 09/20/10. (FNC)
September 20, 2010 5 MOTION to Dismiss by The Birmingham Public Library Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. 1)(Fullerton, Frederic)
September 20, 2010 4 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Birmingham, Alabama, The.(Fullerton, Frederic)
September 17, 2010 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Birmingham, Alabama, The served on 9/16/2010, answer due 10/7/2010. (FNC)
September 13, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to City of Birmingham, Alabama, The, The Birmingham Public Library Foundation, mld cert mail, this date. (FNC)
September 7, 2010 Filing Fee: Filing fee $350, receipt_number 1126-1242689 (NDAL Receipt No. B4601015548). related document 1 COMPLAINT against City of Birmingham, Alabama, The, The Birmingham Public Library Foundation, filed by Barbara Ann Wilson.(FNC). (Morel, Adam) Modified on 9/8/2010 (CVA).
September 2, 2010 Request for service by certified mail filed by Barbara Ann Wilson, contained within the complaint. (FNC)
September 2, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against City of Birmingham, Alabama, The, The Birmingham Public Library Foundation, filed by Barbara Ann Wilson.(FNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. The Birmingham Public Library Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ann Wilson
Represented By: Adam P Morel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Birmingham Public Library Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Birmingham, Alabama, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?