Jackson v. Birmingham, Alabama, City of et al Featured Case

sexual harassment lawsuit

Plaintiff: Karen Jackson
Defendant: Birmingham, Alabama, City of and Birmingham Library Board, The
Case Number: 2:2011cv02632
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE w/prej; any party may reopen case w/i 60 days for good cause shown; costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 8/13/12. (KGE, )
August 9, 2012 Notice: The parties are NOTIFIED that the law clerk in THIS case is Andrew Hatchett. Andrew may be reached at 205-561-1672. The parties are DIRECTED to send COURTESY COPIES in THIS case to the Tuscaloosa Federal Building and Courthouse, 2005 University Blvd, Tuscaloosa, AL 35401. (KGE, )
June 8, 2012 Featured Case ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 10 MOTION to Compel and CANCELLING hearing set for 6/13/2012. Certification of dispute was not filed by 6/7/2012 11 . Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 6/8/2012. (LID)
May 21, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER re: 10 MOTION to Compel. Discovery Hearing set for 6/13/2012 at 9:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL, before Judge L Scott Coogler IF certification of dispute filed by 6/7/2012. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/21/2012. (LID)
May 18, 2012 10 MOTION to Compel by Birmingham Library Board, The, Birmingham, Alabama, City of. (Fullerton, Frederic)
January 13, 2012 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: deadlines as set out including, Discovery due by 7/27/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2012. Status Report due by 8/10/2012. Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 at 9:00 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 1/13/2012. (ADF)
January 11, 2012 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fullerton, Frederic)
January 5, 2012 Notice: The parties are NOTIFIED that the law clerk in THIS case may be reached at 205-542-1125 or Laura_Doheny@alnd.uscourts.gov. The parties are DIRECTED to NOT send COURTESY COPIES in THIS case unless instructed otherwise. (BST)
November 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/23/2012. (ADF)
November 23, 2011 7 Featured Case UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 11/23/2011. (ADF)
November 23, 2011 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Birmingham Library Board, The.(Fullerton, Frederic)
November 23, 2011 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Birmingham, Alabama, City of.(Fullerton, Frederic)
November 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Birmingham Library Board, The answer due 12/5/2011; Birmingham, Alabama, City of answer due 12/5/2011. (BST, )
November 14, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to Birmingham Library Board, The, Birmingham, Alabama, City of, del to pla for service. (BST)
November 14, 2011 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Birmingham Library Board - Renee Blaylock c/o Jennifer Neely on 11/14/11, filed by Karen Jackson. (Morel, Adam)
November 14, 2011 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on City of Birmingham - Lee Frazier c/o Teisha Clark on 11/14/11, filed by Karen Jackson. (Morel, Adam)
September 28, 2011 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 350, USDC receipt_number 1126-1490355, receipt#B4601027028; related document 1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Library Board, The, Birmingham, Alabama, City of, filed by Karen Jackson.(BST, ). (Morel, Adam) Modified on 9/29/2011 (BST, ).
July 21, 2011 NOTICE The parties are NOTIFIED that due to administrative changes in the Tuscaloosa Courthouse, the new Chambers telephone number is 205-561-1670. The law clerks telephone number for THIS case is still 205-278-1827. COURTESY COPIES in THIS case should still be sent to L. Scott Coogler, United States District Court, Northern District of Alabama, 1729 5th Avenue North, Suite 419, Birmingham, Alabama 35203.(BST, )
July 20, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Birmingham Library Board, The, Birmingham, Alabama, City of, filed by Karen Jackson.(BST, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Birmingham, Alabama, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jackson
Represented By: Adam P Morel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham, Alabama, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birmingham Library Board, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?