Duke et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Kent Duke and Jacqueline C Duke
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00157
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The court ORDERS defendant Nationstar to produce the aforementioned items to plaintiffs by January 22, 2013. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/15/13. (KGE, )
November 16, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 41 , Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, is granted in part and denied in part, as further set out in order. The new deadline for delivery of in camera documents is 12/27/12. 31 , Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, to the extent not heretofore granted, is DENIED. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 11/16/12. (CVA)
August 30, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER the order of 3/15/12, is AMENDED pursuant to Rule 54(b) to direct the entry of final judgment in favor of MorEquity and against plas, Kent Duke and spouse, Jacqueline C. Duke; DENYING 22 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Res Judicata; DENYING 26 MOTION to Strike 25 Response in Opposition to Motion. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 8/30/12. (KGE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke et al v. Nationstar Mortgage, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Duke
Represented By: Frank J Russo
Represented By: Robert C Keller
Represented By: Lange Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline C Duke
Represented By: Lange Clark
Represented By: Robert C Keller
Represented By: Frank J Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, L.L.C.
Represented By: David A Elliott
Represented By: Rachel R Friedman
Represented By: Zachary D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?