Ryan et al v. Event Operations Group Inc
Plaintiff: Walter Ryan and Roy Hall
Defendant: Event Operations Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00670
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER for reasons outlined in memorandum opinion, parties' joint motions for approval of settlement (docs #27 , #28 , #29 ) are GRANTED; this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/31/14. (ASL)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/31/14. (ASL)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed the Response to Order to Show Cause (Doc. #25 ) and the proposed amended settlement agreements. (Docs. 25-1, 25-2, 25-3). On or before January 31, 2014, the parties shall file renewed motions for settlement approval along with revised proposed settlement agreements. The renewed motions for settlement approval should clarify the dollar amount each plaintiff is to receive. The revised proposed settlement agreements should incorporate the redline edits contained in the exhibits accompanying the response to the show cause order. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/30/13. (ASL)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Event Operations Group Inc. filed by Event Operations Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Walston, David)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE w/i 14 days why the Court should not strike paragraphs one through six from each agreement before it recommends approval of the settlement agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 5/22/13. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Consent)(ASL)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Claims of Walter Ryan by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement of Claims of Annie Myricks by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval of Settlement Claims of Roy Hall by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #17 parties' motion to refer this action to arbitration; by January 21, 2013, the parties must either advise the Court of their intent to settle, or the named plas must file their motion for conditional class certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline H Haikala on 1/7/13. (ASL)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Supplemental MOTION to Refer Matter to Arbitration by Event Operations Group Inc, Roy Hall, Walter Ryan. (Walston, David)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate-Judge Madeline H Haikala: Telephone Status Conf held on 11/9/2012; ct will take under submission parties' motion to compel arbitration; conf adj;(Chambers)(CJV)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Telephone Conference regarding the joint motion to compel arbitration set for 11/9/2012 02:00 PM before Magistrate-Judge Madeline H Haikala. The parties should call 278-2186 (local) or 866-933-0528 (long-distance) and use access code 3893 to participate in the call. Signed by Magistrate-Judge Madeline H Haikala on 11/07/2012. (CNW)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Event Operations Group Inc. (Walston, David)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Magistrate-Judge Madeline H Haikala. Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene no longer assigned to the case. (KAM, )
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that dft's motion for limited discovery is GRANTED, named plas shall make themselves available for deposition before 12/1/12; plas are ORDERED to file a motion for collective action, if any, before 12/15/12; finally, parties are ORDERED to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by 10/11/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 9/20/12. (ASL)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene: Scheduling Conference held on 7/23/2012(Court Reporter Leah T.)(CJV)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 7/17/12. (ASL)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Roy Hall, Walter Ryan of Filing Additional Consent to Join Suit as Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Camp, Robert)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Event Operations Group Inc.(Walston, David)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Event Operations Group Inc, filed by Walter Ryan, Roy Hall.(Camp, Robert)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File. Defendant has not filed an opposition to the motion. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint electronically with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 6/8/12. (JAH)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting by Event Operations Group Inc, Roy Hall, Walter Ryan. (Camp, Robert)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Walter Ryan, Roy Hall; response to this motion must be filed by 5/25/12; reply must be filed by 6/1/12; motion will be under submission 6/1/12. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 5/17/12. (ASL)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties' Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is due to be filed with the court no more than twenty-one (21) days after the Court enters an order on plaintiffs' motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 5/17/12. (JAH)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Roy Hall, Walter Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Camp, Robert)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell G Allen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Allen, Mitchell)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REVISED ORDER (Rule 26) reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) and LR 26.1(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul W Greene on 3/30/12. (ASL)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Event Operations Group Inc.(Walston, David)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Event Operations Group Inc served on 3/9/2012, answer due 3/30/2012. (FNC)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Event Operations Group Inc; mailed certified mail (ASL)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Roy Hall, Walter Ryan. (ASL)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Event Operations Group Inc (Filing fee $ 350, receipt #B4601031255.), filed by Walter Ryan, Roy Hall.(ASL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. Event Operations Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Ryan
Represented By: Mitchell G Allen
Represented By: Robert J Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hall
Represented By: Mitchell G Allen
Represented By: Robert J Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Event Operations Group Inc
Represented By: David B Walston
Represented By: Robert Jordan Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?