Norman v. Norman et al

Plaintiff: Patrick Noah Norman
Defendant: Tracey C Norman, Lennie Sams, Jr, Janie Neill, D Gregg Rector, Nicholas C Derzis and Hoover, Alabama, City of
Case Number: 2:2012cv02136
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 2/4/2014. (AVC)
April 22, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 4/22/13. (ASL)
March 13, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 3/13/13. (ASL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Norman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Noah Norman
Represented By: Tonya F Burleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey C Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennie Sams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Neill
Represented By: Benjamin T Presley
Represented By: J Bentley Owens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Gregg Rector
Represented By: Benjamin T Presley
Represented By: J Bentley Owens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas C Derzis
Represented By: J Bentley Owens, III
Represented By: Benjamin T Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover, Alabama, City of
Represented By: J Bentley Owens, III
Represented By: Benjamin T Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?