Gadling-Coal v. Lagory et al

Plaintiff: Charnetta Gadling-Coal
Defendant: Mark Lagory, William Cockerham, Lisa Baker, Thomas Delorenzo and University of Alabama at Birmingham
Case Number: 2:2012cv02882
Filed: September 4, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 9/23/15. (SMH)
March 19, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 3/19/2015. (AVC)
April 2, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, as set out, re dfts' Motion to Dismiss 22 & pla's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 26 . Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 4/2/14. (CTS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadling-Coal v. Lagory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charnetta Gadling-Coal
Represented By: Andrew C Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lagory
Represented By: Lisa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cockerham
Represented By: Lisa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Baker
Represented By: Lisa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Delorenzo
Represented By: Lisa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Alabama at Birmingham
Represented By: Lisa Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?