Bell v. Shelby County Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Brittne A Bell
Defendant: Shelby County Alabama, Mike Curry, Prison Healthcare LLC, Harpersville, Town of, The, Alabama, Theoangelo Perkins and Judicial Corrections Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv02991
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/10/2015. (PSM)
October 8, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 10/08/2013. (MSN)
May 21, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 05/21/2013. (MSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Shelby County Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittne A Bell
Represented By: Mary-Ellen Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Alabama
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Curry
Represented By: T Kelly May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Mark W Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harpersville, Town of, The, Alabama
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Represented By: Alvin Donald Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theoangelo Perkins
Represented By: Timothy P Donahue
Represented By: Alvin Donald Scott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judicial Corrections Services Inc
Represented By: Wayne Morse, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?