Health Assurance LLC v. Jefferson County, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Health Assurance LLC
Defendant: Jefferson County, Alabama, Mike Hale and Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv03634
Filed: October 18, 2012
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Robert R Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF OPINION. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 7/23/2015. (PSM)
February 10, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -re: R&R 26 . The court is of the opinion that the magistrate judge's R&R is due to be and is hereby ADOPTED and the recommendation is ACCEPTED. The motion for summary judgment 15 is DENIED. and the stay of the parties' Rule 26 obligations is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Robert B Propst on 2/10/2014. (AVC)
June 27, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/27/13. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health Assurance LLC v. Jefferson County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Assurance LLC
Represented By: Mary-Ellen Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hale
Represented By: James E Murrill, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Correctional Healthcare Inc
Represented By: Brittany A Kimbrough
Represented By: J Rushton McClees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?