Donut Joe's, Inc. v. Beiersdoerfer et al

Plaintiff: Donut Joe's, Inc.
Defendant: Werner Beiersdoerfer, Michael Kenneth Flowers, Donut Chef, Brock Beiersdoerfer, Kimberly Beiersdoerfer and Heavenly Donut Co.
Counter_claimant: Donut Chef, Michael Kenneth Flowers and Werner Beiersdoerfer
Counter_defendant: Donut Joe's, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01578
Filed: August 27, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 84 MOTION to Extend Time for Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/23/2015. (JLC)
July 7, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees. The Court furthermore ORDERS Interveston to submit evidence on the fees incurred and the value and reasonableness of its services within fourteen (14) days of entry of this Order. Donut Joe's will then have seven (7) days to file any opposition to Interveston's evidence. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/7/2015. (JLC)
April 22, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/22/2015. (JLC)
April 24, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION to Dismiss. All claims of the plaintiff against Werner Beiersdoerfer and Michael Kenneth Flowers are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/24/2014. (JLC)
December 18, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the state-law claims filed by Donut Joe's and the state-law counterclaims filed by Werner Beiersdoerfer, Michael Kenneth Flowers, and Interveston Food Services, LLC. TERMED AS MOOT 8 10 14 MOTIONS to Dismiss. There being no remaining claims against Brock and Kimberly Beiersdoerfer, the Clerk is DIRECTED to show them as dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/18/2013. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donut Joe's, Inc. v. Beiersdoerfer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donut Joe's, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Beiersdoerfer
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: G Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kenneth Flowers
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: G Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donut Chef
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Represented By: G Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock Beiersdoerfer
Represented By: Jud C Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Beiersdoerfer
Represented By: Jud C Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavenly Donut Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Donut Chef
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Michael Kenneth Flowers
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Werner Beiersdoerfer
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Jade E Sipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donut Joe's, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?