Mendel et al v. Morgan Keegan & Company Inc

Plaintiff: Jake Mendel
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv01630
Filed: August 30, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER On March 23, 2016, the Eleventh Circuit issued an opinion in this action, reversing and remanding the case for further consideration. For reasons as noted within, this court is requesting the Eleventh Circuit to stay the issuance of the mandate pending an application for rehearing en banc and any ruling on such applications, as well as for possible petitions for certiorari. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 4/4/16. (SAC )
June 30, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The court FIXES a supersedeas bond in the amount of $200,000 which, if approved as to form and as to the corporate surety, shall be posted by Morgan Keegan within 14 days, after which the judgment will be stayed by separate order. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 6/26/15. (SAC )
May 28, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 5/26/15. (SAC )
May 26, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 5/26/15. (SAC )
January 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The motion filed on January 10, 2014, by the Mendel parties, seeking clarification or instructions, is GRANTED to the extent noted within. Mendel parties and Morgan Keegan are permitted on or before January 20, 2014, to file formal motions for summary judgment with accompanying briefs; the evidentiary hearing scheduled for February 4, 2014, is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/14/14. (SAC )
December 3, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 14 First MOTION to Vacate: Plaintiff's appeal and motion to vacate is SET for Evidentiary Hearing on February 4, 2014 at 10:30 AM in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge William M Acker Jr. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 12/3/13. (SAC )
October 28, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jake Mendel; for reasons as set out within, the motion to remand is DENIED. Although the schedule may hereinafter be modified it is ORDERED as follows: Mendel is relieved of any obligation to comply with the procedures in Rule 71B; Mendel shall within fourteen days file a motion or petition to vacate the subject arbitration award, stating the facts and legal theories under which the award should be vacated; Within fourteen d ays after receiving Mendels motion, Morgan Keegan shall answer or otherwise respond to the motion; Each party is allowed to take no more than five depositions, and to submit no more than ten interrogatories, and no more than five requests for production; Discovery shall be completed within ninety days; Dispositive motions shall be filed within thirty days after the expiration of discovery. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 10/28/13. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendel et al v. Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Mendel
Represented By: Richard S Frankowski
Represented By: Charles N Gill
Represented By: Richard H Gill
Represented By: Robert E Norton
Represented By: Richard S Frankowski
Represented By: Charles N Gill
Represented By: Richard H Gill
Represented By: Robert E Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company Inc
Represented By: Kathryn R Eldridge
Represented By: Peter S Fruin
Represented By: William P Martin
Represented By: Bradley B Rounsaville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?