Barrett et al v. Beauty Basics Inc

Plaintiff: Jennifer Barrett, Quana Burpo, Vicky Clemmons, Randi Creighton, Nadia Ivory, Vickie McNeely and Joy Uribe
Defendant: Beauty Basics Inc
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv01989
Filed: October 29, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 44 MOTION to Amend Complaint and this action is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/28/2016. (JLC)
May 10, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 28 MOTION for Leave to File a second amended complaint under the False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. §§ 372933 (FCA). Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/10/2016. (JLC)
June 11, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 6/11/15. (MRR )
February 11, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, as set out, re defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 , An order in accordance will be entered contemporaneously with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Sharon Lovelace Blackburn on 2/11/15. (CTS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. Beauty Basics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Barrett
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quana Burpo
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Clemmons
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Creighton
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadia Ivory
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie McNeely
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Uribe
Represented By: Craig L Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Basics Inc
Represented By: Teresa N Cavenagh(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ollie A Cleveland, III
Represented By: Edward M Cramp(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Donald F Winningham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Jason Ehrlinspiel
Represented By: Joyce White Vance, US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?