Black Warrior Riverkeeper Inc. et al v. U.S Army Corps of Engineers et al

Plaintiff: Black Warrior Riverkeeper Inc. and Defenders of Wildlife
Defendant: U.S Army Corps of Engineers, Thomas P Bostick and Jon Chytka
Movant: Alabama Coal Association, MS&R Equipment Co., Inc., Reed Minerals, Inc., Twin Pines, LLC and Walter Minerals, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02136
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 10/20/15. (SAC )
May 21, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 5/21/14. (SAC)
March 5, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 48 Order filed by Black Warrior Riverkeeper Inc., and 47 MOTION for Expedited Briefing Schedule on the Motion for Summary Judgment; dates and guidelines setout within; to the extent this order is inconsistent with prior orders of this court, this order SUPERCEDES those orders. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 3/5/14. (SAC )
February 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 2/18/14. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black Warrior Riverkeeper Inc. et al v. U.S Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Warrior Riverkeeper Inc.
Represented By: Eva L Dillard
Represented By: James M Hecker
Represented By: Catherine Wannamaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Eva L Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Leslie M Hill
Represented By: Ruth Ann Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P Bostick
Represented By: Leslie M Hill
Represented By: Ruth Ann Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Chytka
Represented By: Leslie M Hill
Represented By: Ruth Ann Storey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Alabama Coal Association
Represented By: David R Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: MS&R Equipment Co., Inc.
Represented By: David R Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Reed Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: David R Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Twin Pines, LLC
Represented By: David R Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Walter Minerals, Inc.
Represented By: David R Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?