Taul v. Nagel Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Barry Taul
Defendant: Nagel Enterprises, Inc. and Jed Nagel
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2014cv00061
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 85 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, DENYING 86 MOTION to Quash, DENYING 87 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Objections to Plaintiff's 2nd Set of Interrogatories & Requests for Production, DENYING 88 MOTION to Amend/Correct, DENYING 96 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Surreply, DENYING 97 MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Motion to file a Response to Pl aintiff's Surreply to Defendants' 2nd Motion to Dismiss. Both parties are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report regarding the status of Nagel's Alabama criminal case, including any appeals by February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 2/1/2017. (JLC)
January 25, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 1/25/2016. (JLC)
September 17, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Nagel Enterprises, Inc., Jed Nagel. The Court will enter a separate Scheduling Order reflecting its determinations on deadlines for the referenced Discovery and Hearing. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 9/17/2014. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taul v. Nagel Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Taul
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: Larry A Golston, Jr
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nagel Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph H Rutledge, II
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Represented By: Gregory F Yaghmai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Nagel
Represented By: Joseph H Rutledge, II
Represented By: W Eugene Rutledge
Represented By: Gregory F Yaghmai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?