Rosen v. UNUM Provident Corporation

Plaintiff: Lawrence Rosen, M.D.
Defendant: UNUM Provident Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv00922
Filed: May 16, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Calhoun
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 7/10/15. (SAC )
July 9, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 7/9/2015. (AVC)
January 29, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDENDUM TO MEMORANDUM OPINION OF JANUARY 21, 2015 In its opinion of January 21, 2015, the court overlooked the significance of Exhibit A attached to Rosen's second amended complaint. The memorandum opinion of January 21, 2015, is AMENDED as noted within. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/29/15. (SAC )
January 21, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/21/15. (SAC )
November 17, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The court's scheduling order is AMENDED to grant Rosen until December 19, 2014, to complete discovery limited to evidence bearing on Providents motion for partial summary judgment, and to file a brief and evidentiary materials in opposition to Providents said motion. Provident shall then have ten calendar days in which to respond to Rosen's said opposition. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 11/17/14. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen v. UNUM Provident Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Rosen, M.D.
Represented By: G Daniel Evans(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Alexandria Parrish(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Provident Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?