Anderson v. United States of America

Plaintiff: William Dean Anderson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2014cv01182
Filed: June 19, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 1/22/16. (SAC )
December 15, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons explained within, Twin City's motion for conditional intervention is GRANTED. This conditional intervention does not include the right to participate in motions for summary judgment or trial on the merits. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 12/15/15. (SAC )
February 2, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For reasons as noted within, counsel for plaintiff are ORDERED within seven days to pay to the Clerk the sum of $500.00 as an appropriate sanction; the status and scheduling conference that was aborted on January 27, 2015, is RESCHEDULED for 10:30 a.m., February 11, 2015 in chambers of the undersigned; if the parties can mutually agree on a proposed schedule pursuant to Rule 26, they shall bring their proposal to the conference. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 2/2/15. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dean Anderson
Represented By: H Lewis Gillis
Represented By: Kristen J Gillis
Represented By: Tyrone Carlton Means
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?