Greene v. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.

Plaintiff: Frenchie Greene
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Case Number: 2:2014cv01684
Filed: August 29, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/28/2016. (KAM, )
June 3, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER, denying 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P... Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 6/3/2016. (KAM, )
December 2, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 12/2/14. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frenchie Greene
Represented By: Frank S Buck(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rachel Catherine Buck(Designation Retained)
Represented By: James Brooks Leach(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Marda W Sydnor(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?