Emergency Response Specialists Inc v. CSA Ocean Sciences Inc et al

Plaintiff: Emergency Response Specialists Inc
Defendant: CSA Ocean Sciences Inc and Noble Energy Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv02214
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: William M Acker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER -re: R&R 79 . The court hereby ADOPTS the report and ACCEPTS the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. The Motion for Protective order 56 is MOOT. The Motion for Sanctions 58 is DENIED to the extent it seeks an order precluding Lisa Mo ore from testifying as an expert witness at trial. The Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED to the extent it seeks attorneys fees and costs, CSA is AWARDED attorney's fees' in the amount of $1600.00 and costs in the amount of $622.50, joint and severally against Mr. James T. Baxter, III, and ERS. The motion to Exclude Emergency Response Specialists, Inc.'s Expert Lisa Moore 61 is DENIED. The Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Noble Energy, Inc., and Noble Energy Mediterranean, Ltd. 62 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2016. (AVC)
April 6, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER For the reasons outlined within, the motion to stay (Doc. 42) and the motion for a protective order and to terminate deposition (Doc. 46) are DENIED. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 4/6/16. (SAC )
February 17, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re 30 Plaintiff's attorneys for leave to withdraw- For the reasons noted within, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 2/17/16. (SAC )
April 23, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge William M Acker, Jr on 4/23/15. (SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emergency Response Specialists Inc v. CSA Ocean Sciences Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emergency Response Specialists Inc
Represented By: Gregory H Revera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSA Ocean Sciences Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?