PNC Bank, National Association v. Cedar Creek of East Alabama LLC et al

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Cedar Creek of East Alabama LLC, Lee D Roberson and Scott D McNay
Case Number: 2:2015cv00349
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sharon Lovelace Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 40 MOTION for Reconsideration and Renewed Motion To Strike Jury Demand. The Jury demand made by Defendants in their 13 Answer is HEREBY STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/13/2016. (JLC)
April 7, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING PNC Bank's 35 Motion To Reconsider. Further, PNC Bank's Rule 56 Motion, upon reconsideration, is GRANTED as to Defendants' liability with the right of PNC to: (i) submit to chambers email a Co nsent Judgment, no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, May 30, 2016, for the Court to enter that has been approved by Defendants counsel or (ii) separately prove its contractual damages to a jury. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 4/7/2016. (JLC)
March 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Sever, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 31 MOTION to Strike or alternatively TERMED as MOOT. Normally the Court would, by separate Order, set this case for a Final Pretrial Conference. However, standing is a precondition for a trial. Therefore, the Court HEREBY ORDERS PNC to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days from the entry date of this Order, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/16/2016. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Cedar Creek of East Alabama LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Matthew W Grill(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert K Ozols(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Creek of East Alabama LLC
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Represented By: James A Harris, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: James A Harris, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee D Roberson
Represented By: Nicole Mapp Hardee
Represented By: James A Harris, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D McNay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?